No. 15-533 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | October 28, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Indiana |
Case Nos.: | (45S00-0803-DP-12522) |
Decision Date: | May 20, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 28, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 23 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 27, 2015) |
Dec 1 2015 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 28, 2015. |
Dec 28 2015 | Brief of respondent Indiana in opposition filed. |
Jan 8 2016 | Reply of petitioner Kevin Charles Isom filed. |
Jan 13 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2016. |
Feb 1 2016 | Supplemental brief of petitioner Kevin Charles Isom filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 29 2016 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
G. Ben Cohen | 636 Baronne Street | (504) 529-5955 |
New Orleans, LA 70113 | ||
bcohen@thejusticecenter.org | ||
Party name: Kevin Charles Isom | ||
Attorneys for Respondent: | ||
Stephen R. Creason | Chief Counsel | (317) 232-6222 |
Counsel of Record | Office of Attorney General | |
IGCS, 5th Floor | ||
302 West Washington Street | ||
Indianapolis, IN 46204-2770 | ||
steve.creason@atg.in.gov | ||
Party name: Indiana | ||
Thomas M. Fisher | Solicitor General | (317) 232-6201 |
Counsel of Record | IGC South, Fifth Floor | |
302 W. Washington Street | ||
Indianapolis, IN 46204 | ||
Tom.Fisher@atg.in.gov | ||
Party name: Indiana |